+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on May 9, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-240.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 918
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 917
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 916
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 706
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 917
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
May 9, 2013: Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 916
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
May 9, 2013: Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 918
- Yeas: 31
May 2, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor