+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary first Amendment Offered
- Marsh motion to Rerefer a Bill adopted Voice Vote
- Rereferred to Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 71
- Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 70
- Hill (J) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 68
- England Amendment Offered
- Hill (J) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 69
- Todd Amendment #2 Offered
- Todd motion to withdraw her amendmnet adopted Voice Vote
- Todd Amendment #1 Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2015: Roll 68
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 15
March 12, 2015: Roll 69
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 13
March 12, 2015: Roll 70
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 12
March 12, 2015: Roll 71
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor