+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1315
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Local Legislation first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 973
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 974
- Engrossed
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1315
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
May 17, 2017: Roll 973
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 72
May 17, 2017: Roll 974
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 86
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor