+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Forwarded to Secretary of State at 4:08 p.m. on May 26, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-217.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1133
- Third Reading Passed
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 672
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2015: Roll 1133
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
May 12, 2015: Roll 672
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor