+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Pittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1326
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- State Government Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 900
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 901
- Engrossed
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1326
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2017: Roll 900
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 12
May 16, 2017: Roll 901
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor