+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:11 p.m. on March 19, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-23.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 183
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 2
- Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2015: Roll 183
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
March 10, 2015: Roll 2
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor