+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 975
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 974
- Health and Human Services first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 386
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 385
- Health Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 4, 2016: Roll 974
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
May 4, 2016: Roll 975
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
March 23, 2016: Roll 385
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 10
March 23, 2016: Roll 386
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor