+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 88
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 88 Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor