+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-396.
- Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1190
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 276
- Drake intended to vote "Yea"
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Vote
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1190
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor