+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-378.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1152
- Third Reading Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 940
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 826
- Third Reading Passed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1152
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 7
May 9, 2013: Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 940
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6