+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-539)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-539.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Judiciary first Substitute Offered
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1287
- Concurrence Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1458
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1457
- Smitherman Amendment Offered
- Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1456
- Judiciary zeroeth Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Wadsworth Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 723
- Sorrell Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 724
- Sorrell 2nd Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 725
- Givan Amendment Offered
- Faulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 726
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 727
- Engrossed
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Carried Over
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
May 31, 2019: Roll 1287
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
May 31, 2019: Roll 1456
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
May 31, 2019: Roll 1457
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
May 31, 2019: Roll 1458
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
May 15, 2019: Roll 723
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 13
May 15, 2019: Roll 724
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 22
May 15, 2019: Roll 725
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 23
May 15, 2019: Roll 726
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 10
May 15, 2019: Roll 727
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor