+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-352.
- Delivered to Governor at 9:50 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1134
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 925
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
+ − Vote
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1134
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor