+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Wilcox motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1009
- Concurrence Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Figures motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Local Legislation, Mobile County Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Figures first Substitute Offered
- Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1136
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1137
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 732
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 731
- Wilcox first Substitute Offered
- Wilcox motion to Table adopted Roll Call 730
- Mobile County Legislation Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1009
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 6
May 17, 2017: Roll 1136
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 17
May 17, 2017: Roll 1137
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 17
May 3, 2017: Roll 730
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 76
May 3, 2017: Roll 731
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 69
May 3, 2017: Roll 732
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 71
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor