+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 4:49 p.m. on March 11.2014.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- McCampbell motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 666
- Concurrence Requested
- Assigned Act No. 2014-174.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 719
- Third Reading Passed
- Singleton Amendment Offered
- Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 718
- Singleton motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
- Singleton Amendment Offered
- Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 740
- Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 741
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 461
- Third Reading Passed
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2014: McCampbell motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 666
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
March 6, 2014: Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 741
- Yeas: 15
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 719
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 5
March 6, 2014: Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 718
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2014: Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 740
- Yeas: 15
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor