+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-376.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1149
- Third Reading Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 984
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 808
- Third Reading Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1149
- Yeas: 18
- Absent: 4
May 9, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 984
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 5