+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 970
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On September 10, 0018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-77)
+ − Vote
March 22, 2018: Roll 970
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 82
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor