+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:36 p.m. on May 28, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-331.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1244
- Third Reading Passed
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 515
- Third Reading Passed
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2015: Roll 1244
April 28, 2015: Roll 515
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 61
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor