+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:50 p.m. on August 11, 2015.
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-520.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 70
- Third Reading Passed
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 35
- Third Reading Passed
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
August 11, 2015: Roll 70
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
August 7, 2015: Roll 35
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 83
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor