+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Forwarded to Executive Department
- Concurrence Requested
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-452.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1168
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1169
- Pittman Amendment Offered
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1120
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 878
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 877
- DeMarco first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2014: DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1120
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 1
April 3, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1169
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
April 3, 2014: Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1168
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
April 2, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
March 19, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 877
- Yeas: 100
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor