+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 833
- Third Reading Passed
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 591
- Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2016: Roll 833
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
April 13, 2016: Roll 591
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 89
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor