+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:24 a.m. on June3, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-343.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1303
- Third Reading Passed
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Shelby County
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 796
- Third Reading Passed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2015: Roll 1303
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
May 19, 2015: Roll 796
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 79
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor