+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-486)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1433
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1432
- Holley motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2021-486.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 656
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 655
- Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2021: Roll 1432
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
May 17, 2021: Roll 1433
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
April 6, 2021: Roll 655
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
April 6, 2021: Roll 656
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor