+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded to Secretary of State at 11:14 a.m. on May 19,2017.
- Assigned Act No. 2017-334.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- South motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1008
- Boothe motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
- South motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1007
- Concurrence Requested
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Allen Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1029
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1030
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 517
- Resolution of Local Application Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 516
- Third Reading Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (6)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1007
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 46
May 19, 2017: Roll 1008
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 20
May 11, 2017: Roll 1029
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
May 11, 2017: Roll 1030
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
April 18, 2017: Roll 516
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 41
April 18, 2017: Roll 517
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 77
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor