+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 402
- Third Reading Passed
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Vote
February 20, 2018: Roll 402
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor