+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- On Third Reading in House of Origin
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postpone
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- On Third Reading in House of Origin
- Adopt
- Substitute a Companion Bill
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Favorably
- AMD/SUB
- Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
- Read Second Time in House of Origin
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- AMD/SUB
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Pending
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Read First Time in House of Origin
- Introduced and Referred
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 27, 2023: Adopt Vote
- Yeas: 105
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor