+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 317
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Vote
April 9, 2015: Roll 317
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 9