+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-361.
- Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1073
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 997
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 949
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 950
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 951
- Engrossed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1073
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
May 9, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 997
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 2
May 9, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 949
- Yeas: 96
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 950
- Yeas: 100
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor