+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-250)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-250.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 747
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 417
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2019: Roll 747
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
April 30, 2019: Roll 417
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 88
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor