+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Health
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Wallace Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 508
- Holmes (A) motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 509
- Melton 1st Amendment Offered
- Wallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 510
- Bracy Amendment Offered
- Hurst intended to vote "Yea"
- Wallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 511
- Melton 2nd Amendment Offered
- Wallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 512
- Hurst intended to vote "Nay"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 513
- Engrossed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2014: Holmes (A) motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 509
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 54
March 4, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 508
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 23
March 4, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 513
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 24
March 4, 2014: Wallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 510
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 25
March 4, 2014: Wallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 511
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 25
March 4, 2014: Wallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 512
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 27
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor