+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1113
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 41
May 7, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1113 Vote
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 84
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor