+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Carried Over
- On Third Reading in Second House
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1015
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
May 2, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 50
May 2, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1015 Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 88
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor