+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 27, 2021 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postponed in House of Origin
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postponed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 346
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred from EP to W&ME
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor