+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-360.
- Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1124
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 954
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 588
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1124
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 13
May 9, 2013: Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 954
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor