+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 22, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-214)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on April 8, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-214.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 842
- Third Reading Passed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 515
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2021: Roll 842
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
March 30, 2021: Roll 515
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 84
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor