+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2020-159)
On May 9, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
- Assigned Act No. 2020-159.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 9, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 655
- Third Reading Passed
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 390
- Third Reading Passed
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2020: Roll 655
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
May 6, 2020: Roll 390
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 66
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor