+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 683
- Third Reading Passed
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
+ − Vote
April 7, 2021: Roll 683
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor