+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-539)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1217
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Scott motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1075
- Concurrence Requested
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2018-539.
- Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sanford motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Sanford motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1194
- Sanford Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pittman motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1068
- Finance and Taxation General Fund 2nd Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1067
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 742
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 741
- W&MGF 2nd Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 740
- W&MGF 1st Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 28, 2018: Roll 1217
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
March 28, 2018: Roll 1075
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
March 27, 2018: Roll 1194
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 6
March 22, 2018: Roll 1067
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
March 22, 2018: Roll 1068
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 13, 2018: Roll 740
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
March 13, 2018: Roll 741
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 11
March 13, 2018: Roll 742
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor