+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 831
- Third Reading Passed
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 514
- Third Reading Passed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2016: Roll 831
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
April 7, 2016: Roll 514
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 87
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor