+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 25, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-55)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-456.
- Delivered to Governor at 2:22 p.m. on May 6, 2021.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 395
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2021-55.
- Delivered to Governor at 2:29 p.m. on March 4, 2021.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 154
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2021: Roll 395
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
February 25, 2021: Roll 154
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor