+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:54 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Singleton second Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Singleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-341.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Singleton first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Singleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Singleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1449
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1450
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- England motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1295
- Tuggle intended to vote "Nay"
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 700
- England motion to Table adopted Roll Call 699
- Bracy Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 698
- Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
June 4, 2015: Roll 1295
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 11
June 4, 2015: Roll 1449
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
June 4, 2015: Roll 1450
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
May 12, 2015: Roll 698
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 12
May 12, 2015: Roll 699
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 17
May 12, 2015: Roll 700
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor