+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government per Rule 50(b)
- Read for the second time
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Shelby County
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 857
- Motion to Local Application Roll Call 858
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rereferred from Calendar to TU&I
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2018: Roll 857
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 36
March 15, 2018: Roll 858
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor