+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 884
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
+ − Vote
March 20, 2018: Roll 884
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 77
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor