+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-524)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-524.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1411
- Third Reading Passed
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 698
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2019: Roll 1411
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
May 14, 2019: Roll 698
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor