+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 561
- Third Reading Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
+ − Vote
April 16, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 561
- Yeas: 101
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor