+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-193)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-193.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Melson motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 745
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 744
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 415
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 414
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 413
- England Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (5)
May 15, 2019: Roll 744
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
May 15, 2019: Roll 745
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
April 30, 2019: Roll 413
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 7
April 30, 2019: Roll 414
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 19
April 30, 2019: Roll 415
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor