+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:31 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
- Concurrence Requested
- Assigned Act No. 2014-332.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered
- Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1081
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1082
- Third Reading Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- England motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1050
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 290
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 289
- England first Substitute Offered
- England motion to Table adopted Roll Call 288
- County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2014: Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1081
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 3
April 1, 2014: England motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1050
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 2
April 1, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1082
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
February 13, 2014: England motion to Table adopted Roll Call 288
- Yeas: 97
February 13, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 289
- Yeas: 101
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor