+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-512)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-512.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1132
- Third Reading Passed
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 597
- Third Reading Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: Roll 1132
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 6, 2018: Roll 597
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 88
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor