+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Further Consideration
- Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-332.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 530
- Third Reading Passed
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
+ − Vote
March 30, 2021: Roll 530
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor