+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-457)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:17 a.m. on March 22, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-457.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 954
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acted on by Health and Human Services as Favorable
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 757
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 756
- Health first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2018: Roll 954
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 10
March 13, 2018: Roll 756
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2018: Roll 757
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor