+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927
- Third Reading Passed
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 611
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 610
- Financial Services Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2016: Roll 927
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
April 13, 2016: Roll 609
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2016: Roll 610
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2016: Roll 611
- Yeas: 105
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor